FL H0035 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 84 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 84 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Renames Gulf Coast Community College as "Gulf Coast State College"; renames Pensacola Junior College as "Pensacola State College"; renames St. Johns River Community College as "St. Johns River State College"; renames Valencia Community College as "Valencia College."
Title
Florida College System Institutions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-03 | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 84 (Ch. | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 1 -HJ 415 | |
2011-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 04/05/11, 8:00 am, Reed Hall | |
2011-03-21 | Now in Education Committee -HJ 265 | |
2011-03-18 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-03-17 | CS by K-20 Competitiveness Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 260 | |
2011-03-15 | On Committee agenda-- K-20 Competitiveness Subcommittee, 03/17/11, 3:15 pm, 306 HOB | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 9 | |
2011-01-10 | Referred to K-20 Competitiveness Subcommittee; Education Committee -HJ 9 | |
2010-12-01 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0084 () 2011-05-04 - Ordered enrolled -SJ 851
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1000 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 74 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 75 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 8175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |