FL S0084 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-04 - Ordered enrolled -SJ 851
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-04 - Ordered enrolled -SJ 851
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Renames Gulf Coast Community College as "Gulf Coast State College." Renames Pensacola Junior College as "Pensacola State College." Renames St. Johns River Community College as "St. Johns River State College." Renames Valencia Community College as "Valencia College." Amends provisions relating to linkage institutes, the Florida School of the Arts, and the consolidation of certain training schools. Conforms provisions.
Title
Community Colleges
Sponsors
Sen. Don Gaetz [R] | Senate Higher Education Committee | Sen. Evelyn Lynn [R] | Sen. Steve Oelrich [R] |
Sen. David Simmons [R] | Sen. John Thrasher [R] | Sen. Stephen Wise [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-04 | Ordered enrolled -SJ 851 | |
2011-05-04 | Read 3rd time -HJ 1111 | |
2011-05-03 | Read 2nd time -HJ 1025 | |
2011-05-02 | Referred to Calendar -HJ 1005 | |
2011-03-29 | In Messages | |
2011-03-24 | Read 3rd time -SJ 284 | |
2011-03-23 | Read 2nd time -SJ 267 | |
2011-03-21 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/23/11 | |
2011-03-16 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 232 | |
2011-03-15 | Favorable by- Budget; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 -SJ 232 | |
2011-03-14 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 03/15/11, 3:15 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-03-11 | Favorable by Budget Subcommittee on Higher Education Appropriations; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -SJ 204 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 18 | |
2011-02-17 | Now in Budget -SJ 118 | |
2011-02-10 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-02-08 | CS by Higher Education; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 -SJ 118 | |
2011-01-31 | On Committee agenda-- Higher Education, 02/08/11, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building | |
2010-11-29 | Referred to Higher Education; Budget -SJ 18 | |
2010-11-23 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0035 () 2011-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 84 (Ch.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1000 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 74 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 75 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 8175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |