FL H0027 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes extension to school district educational plant survey submission deadline; provides restrictions; provides requirements for submission of request for extension to DOE & requires department approval; provides restrictions on school district construction during extension period.
Title
Educational Plant Surveys
Sponsors
Rep. Evan Jenne [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 9 | |
2011-01-10 | Referred to K-20 Competitiveness Subcommittee; Rulemaking and Regulation Subcommittee; Education Committee -HJ 9 | |
2010-11-22 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0254 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/27 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0027/BillText/Filed/HTML |