FL H0017 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on August 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7005 (Ch. 2014-216)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7005 (Ch. 2014-216)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes governing body of county to create yellow dot critical motorist medical information program for certain purposes; provides for limited use of information by emergency medical responders.
Title
Motorist Safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7005 (Ch. 2014-216) |
2014-03-27 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-03-24 | House | CS/CS by Economic Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2014-03-21 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-03-21 | House | CS/CS by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-19 | House | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 03/21/14, 9:00 am, Reed Hall |
2014-03-07 | House | Now in Economic Affairs Committee |
2014-03-06 | House | Favorable by Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-04 | House | CS by Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee read 1st time |
2014-03-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 03/06/14, 10:00 am, Webster Hall |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-01-27 | House | Now in Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2014-01-15 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2014-01-14 | House | CS by Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2014-01-07 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee, 01/14/14, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2013-10-07 | House | Referred to Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee; Economic Affairs Committee |
2013-08-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0019 (Related) 2014-05-02 - Died on Calendar
S0262 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7005 (Ch. 2014-216)
S0350 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Messages
H7005 (Similar To) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-216, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 820 (Ch. 2014-228)
S0262 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7005 (Ch. 2014-216)
S0350 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Messages
H7005 (Similar To) 2014-06-20 - Chapter No. 2014-216, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 820 (Ch. 2014-228)