FL S0350 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exemption from public records requirements for personal identifying information of participants in a yellow dot critical motorist medical information program; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records/Yellow Dot Critical Motorist Medical Information Program
Sponsors
Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability Committee | Senate Health Policy Committee | Rep. Joseph Abruzzo [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died in Messages |
2014-04-25 | House | In Messages |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2014-04-25 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/14 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/09/14, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2014-04-03 | Senate | CS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | CS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/03/14, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2014-03-04 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2014-02-11 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2014-02-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/11/14, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Now in Health Policy |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2013-12-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/09/14, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2013-11-07 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Health Policy; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2013-11-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0262 (Related) 2014-05-02 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7005 (Ch. 2014-216)
H0017 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7005 (Ch. 2014-216)
H0019 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died on Calendar
H0017 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7005 (Ch. 2014-216)
H0019 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died on Calendar