FL H0011 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7078 (Ch. 2015-79)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts certain membership organizations from licensing requirements & minimum standards for child care facilities; provides screening requirements for organization employees under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Care of Children

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28HouseDied in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7078 (Ch. 2015-79)
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2014-12-19HouseReferred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Education Committee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2014-11-19HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S0250 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Community Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7078 (Ch. 2015-79)
S7078 (Similar To) 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-79

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
402301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
402302Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback