FL S7078 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-79
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing critical incident rapid response teams to review cases of child deaths occurring during an open investigation; requiring case staffing when medical neglect is substantiated; requiring an epidemiological child abuse death assessment and prevention system; providing intent for the operation of and interaction between the state and local death review committees, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Welfare

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#52 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#386 (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-22 Chapter No. 2015-79
2015-05-21 Approved by Governor
2015-05-07 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-04-29SenateOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2015-04-29SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2015-04-29SenateConcurred in 3 amendment(s) (525329, 597643, 756353)
2015-04-28SenateIn returning messages
2015-04-28HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 116 NAYS 1
2015-04-28HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-28HouseAmendment(s) failed (555083)
2015-04-28HouseAmendment(s) adopted (525329, 597643, 756353)
2015-04-28HouseSubstituted for CS/HB 7121
2015-04-28HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-27HouseReceived
2015-04-27HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/15
2015-04-27HouseReferred to Calendar
2015-04-24HouseIn Messages
2015-04-24SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
2015-04-24SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-23SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-23SenateOrdered engrossed
2015-04-23SenateAmendment(s) adopted (165228, 315116, 725524)
2015-04-23SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-21SenateCS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
2015-04-21SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/15
2015-04-21SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-04-21SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-04-20SenateCS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2015-04-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/20/15, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2015-04-13SenateIntroduced
2015-04-09SenateReferred to Fiscal Policy
2015-04-03SenateFiled
2015-03-30SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 04/02/15, 11:30 am, 301 Senate Office Building -- Submitted as Committee Bill; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2015-03-30SenateSubmitted for consideration by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs

Same As/Similar To

H7121 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7078 (Ch. 2015-79)
H0011 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7078 (Ch. 2015-79)
S0250 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Community Affairs, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7078 (Ch. 2015-79)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1006061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
125901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
383402Amended CodeSee Bill Text
392015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
393068Amended CodeSee Bill Text
402301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
402302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409977Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409986Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409988Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43502Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7078
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7078/BillText/pb/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7078/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7078/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7078/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7078/BillText/e2/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7078/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7078/Amendment/247066/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7078/Amendment/234884/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7078/Amendment/725524/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7078/Amendment/315116/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7078/Amendment/165228/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7078/Amendment/694488/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7078/Amendment/285034/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7078/Amendment/597643/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7078/Amendment/756353/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7078/Amendment/525329/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7078/Amendment/555083/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7078/Amendment/680757/PDF
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7078/Amendment/702814/HTML
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7078/Vote/SenateVote_s7078e1004.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7078/Vote/HouseVote_s7078e1386.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/7078/Vote/SenateVote_s7078e1052.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback