TN HB2125 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, designates November as "Christian Heritage Month." - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 1, relative to periods of observance.
Sponsors
Rep. Rusty Grills [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Monty Fritts [R] | Rep. Bryan Richey [R] |
Rep. Kip Capley [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. Ed Butler [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] |
Rep. Jake McCalmon [R] | Rep. Jason Zachary [R] | Rep. Dennis Powers [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] |
Rep. Lowell Russell [R] | Rep. Kelly Keisling [R] | Rep. Joe Towns [D] | Rep. Andrew Farmer [R] |
Rep. Chris Hurt [R] | Rep. Jody Barrett [R] | Rep. William Slater [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Signed by Governor. | |
2024-04-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-04 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-02 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 26, Nays 2 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-03-14 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-03-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-14 | House | Passed H., Ayes 70, Nays 13, PNV 3 |
2024-03-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/14/2024 |
2024-03-11 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2024-03-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-07 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/11/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/7/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-06 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/28/2024 |
2024-02-20 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 2/20/2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee |
2024-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2024-01-25 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2306 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-28 - Sponsor(s) Added.