CA SB1414 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on August 31 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-13 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on August 31 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-13 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 290 and 647 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes.
Title
Crimes: solicitation of a minor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1414 Grove et al. Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1414 Grove Senate Third Reading By Stephanie Nguyen (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1414 Grove et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Amendments (Committee's) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1414 Grove Senate Third Reading By Stephanie Nguyen (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1414 Grove et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Amendments (Committee's) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2024-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2024-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2024-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-08-22 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2024-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 15). |
2024-08-15 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-08-07 | Assembly | August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2024-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4190.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3982.) (May 16). |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3638.) (April 16). |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 290 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 647 | Amended Code | Citation Text |