FL H0003 | 2015 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2502-A (Ch. 2015-222)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Implements specific appropriations of the General Appropriations Act for the 2015-2016 fiscal year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Implementing the 2015-2016 General Appropriations Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-04HouseLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2502-A (Ch. 2015-222)
2015-06-04HouseTemporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
2015-06-03HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 06/04/15
2015-06-01HouseReferred to Calendar
2015-06-01HouseIntroduced
2015-05-27HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S2500 (Similar To) 2015-08-18 - Line Item Veto Message referred to Rules
S2502 (Similar To) 2015-06-23 - Chapter No. 2015-222, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2516-A (Ch. 2015-229)
H0001 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2502-A (Ch. 2015-222), SB 2504-A (Ch. 2015-223), SB 2506-A (Ch. 2015-224), SB 2508-A (Ch. 2015-225), SB 2510-A (Ch. 2015-226), SB 2512-A (Ch. 2015-227), SB 2514-A (Ch. 2015-228), SB 2516-A (Ch. 2015-229), SB 2520-A (Ch. 2015-230), SB 2522-A (Ch. 2015-231)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
101162Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101275Amended CodeSee Bill Text
11012315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
11224Amended CodeSee Bill Text
161143Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20435Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21518Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21532Amended CodeSee Bill Text
216181Amended CodeSee Bill Text
216262Amended CodeSee Bill Text
216292Amended CodeSee Bill Text
259105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
282709Amended CodeSee Bill Text
29637Amended CodeSee Bill Text
339135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3763071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
388261Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403890Amended CodeSee Bill Text
624502Amended CodeSee Bill Text
893055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9327055Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback