FL S2502 | 2015 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - Chapter No. 2015-222, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2516-A (Ch. 2015-229)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Incorporating by reference certain calculations of the Florida Education Finance Program; revising the definition of the term "disability" for purposes of the Florida Personal Learning Scholarship Accounts Program; requiring the Department of Education to administer an educator liability insurance program for certain full-time instructional personnel; requiring a State University System Performance-Based Incentive to be awarded to state universities using certain performance-based metrics and benchmarks adopted by the Board of Governors; revising the authorized uses of funds in the Medical Quality Assurance Trust Fund, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Implementing the General Appropriations Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-19 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#440 (Y: 94 N: 19 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#407 (Y: 82 N: 24 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-23 Chapter No. 2015-222, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2516-A (Ch. 2015-229)
2015-06-23 Approved by Governor
2015-06-19 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-06-19SenateOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2015-06-19HousePassed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 94 NAYS 19
2015-06-19HouseConference Committee Report adopted (651318)
2015-06-19HouseConference Committee Report considered
2015-06-19HouseIn returning messages
2015-06-19SenatePassed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2015-06-19SenateConference Committee Report adopted (651318)
2015-06-19SenateConference Committee Report received
2015-06-05SenateConference Committee appointed: Appropriations Conference Committee: Lee (Chair), Benacquisto (Vice Chair), Flores (At Large), Galvano (At Large), Grimsley (At Large), Joyner (At Large), Margolis (At Large), Richter (At Large), Simmons (At Large), Smith (At Large); Appropriations Conference Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice/Justice: Negron (Chair), Bradley, Evers, Flores, Hutson, Joyner; Appropriations Conference Committee on Education/Education: Gaetz (Chair), Bullard, Galvano, Legg, Montford, Simmons, Stargel; Appropriations Conference Committee on General Government/Government Operations: Hays (Chair), Altman, Braynon, Dean, Margolis, Simpson; Appropriations Conference Committee on Health and Human Services/Health Care: Garcia (Chair), Bean, Benacquisto, Grimsley, Richter, Smith, Sobel; Appropriations Conference Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development/Transportation and Economic Development: Latvala (Chair), Brandes, Clemens, Detert, Diaz de la Portilla, Gibson, Hukill, Sachs, Thompson
2015-06-05HouseConference Committee appointed: Representatives Corcoran (Chair), Boyd (Vice Chair), Broxson, Combee, Gonzalez, La Rosa, Mayfield, Smith, Pilon, Trumbull, Bracy, Jacobs, Powell, Watson, C., Adkins, Cortes, B., Diaz, M., Fitzenhagen, Porter, Rodrigues, R., Stone, Lee, Slosberg, Taylor, Baxley, Eagle, Passidomo, Plasencia, Raulerson, Antone, Campbell, Dudley, Narain, Brodeur, Cummings, Fant, Harrell, Magar, Pigman, Renner, Stevenson, Berman, Murphy, Ahern, Burgess, Grant, Hill, Latvala, Miller, Spano, Edwards, McGhee, Pritchett, Artiles, Avila, Burton, Drake, Moraitis, Perry, Peters, Ray, Fullwood, Jones, S., Rogers, Stark, Albritton (At Large), Caldwell (At Large), Diaz, J. (At Large), Eisnaugle (At Large), Fresen (At Large), Gaetz (At Large), Goodson (At Large), Hudson (At Large), Ingram (At Large), McBurney (At Large), Metz (At Large), Nunez (At Large), Oliva (At Large), O'Toole (At Large), Porter (At Large), Raschein (At Large), Wood (At Large), Young (At Large), Clarke-Reed (At Large), Cruz (At Large), Jones, M. (At Large), Pafford (At Large), Richardson (At Large), Rouson (At Large), Stafford (At Large), Williams (At Large)
2015-06-04SenateIn returning messages
2015-06-04HouseRefused to pass the Senate bill as passed by the Senate and acceded to the request for conference
2015-06-04HousePassed as amended; YEAS 82 NAYS 24
2015-06-04HouseRead 3rd time
2015-06-04HouseAmendment(s) adopted (829207)
2015-06-04HouseRead 2nd time
2015-06-03HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 06/04/15
2015-06-03HouseReceived
2015-06-03HouseReferred to Calendar
2015-06-01HouseIn Messages
2015-06-01SenateThe Senate requests that the House pass the bill as passed by the Senate or agree to include the bill in the Budget Conference
2015-06-01SenatePassed; YEAS 35 NAYS 0
2015-06-01SenateRead 3rd time
2015-06-01SenateRead 2nd time
2015-06-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-06-01SenateWithdrawn from Appropriations
2015-06-01SenateReferred to Appropriations
2015-06-01SenateIntroduced
2015-05-22SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S2500 (Similar To) 2015-08-18 - Line Item Veto Message referred to Rules
S2516 (Similar To) 2015-06-23 - Chapter No. 2015-229, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2502-A (Ch. 2015-222)
H0003 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2502-A (Ch. 2015-222)
H0001 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2502-A (Ch. 2015-222), SB 2504-A (Ch. 2015-223), SB 2506-A (Ch. 2015-224), SB 2508-A (Ch. 2015-225), SB 2510-A (Ch. 2015-226), SB 2512-A (Ch. 2015-227), SB 2514-A (Ch. 2015-228), SB 2516-A (Ch. 2015-229), SB 2520-A (Ch. 2015-230), SB 2522-A (Ch. 2015-231)
H0015 (Similar To) 2015-06-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2516-A (Ch. 2015-229), SB 2500-A (Ch. 2015-232), SB 2502-A (Ch. 2015-222)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100192Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100220Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002385Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002395Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100294Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1003497Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100628Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100642Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100846Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1009534Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1009535Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1009536Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101162Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101167Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101171Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101275Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101364Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1113Amended CodeSee Bill Text
11012315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
11224Amended CodeSee Bill Text
161143Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20435Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21518Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21532Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21598Amended CodeSee Bill Text
216177Amended CodeSee Bill Text
216181Amended CodeSee Bill Text
216262Amended CodeSee Bill Text
216292Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21823Amended CodeSee Bill Text
255249Amended CodeSee Bill Text
259105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
27022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
282709Amended CodeSee Bill Text
287042Amended CodeSee Bill Text
287057Amended CodeSee Bill Text
29637Amended CodeSee Bill Text
339135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3392816Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3392818Amended CodeSee Bill Text
341302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
376307Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3763071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3810065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
388261Amended CodeSee Bill Text
393065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
393067Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39318Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403709Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4037095Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409919Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409978Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409979Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409991Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4205087Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4209072Amended CodeSee Bill Text
624502Amended CodeSee Bill Text
893055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9327055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985686Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback