DE SB71 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on June 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on June 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act requires law-enforcement agencies, the Department of Services for Children, Youth and Their Families, and the Department of Justice to report suspected animal cruelty to the Office of Animal Welfare that is discovered while performing their responsibilities in child welfare cases. This Act also provides immunity to people who in good faith, report suspected animal cruelty.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Reporting Suspected Animal Cruelty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-27 | Signed by Governor | |
2023-05-09 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2023-05-03 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 3 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |
2023-04-26 | Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |
2023-04-25 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2023-04-05 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 6 Favorable | |
2023-03-28 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |