DE SB261 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This legislation implements recommendations made by the Delaware Waterways Management and Financing Advisory Committee, which was formed by the passage of Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 64 in 2014. It establishes a sustainable and dedicated source of funding (waterway management fund) to be used exclusively to support the maintenance of Delaware’s public waterways, including navigational channel dredging and marking, and any other activities that may be identified to preserve, maintain and enhance safe navigation for the State’s 60,000 registered boaters. Many of the waterway management responsibilities previously handled by the U. S. Army Corps of Engineers and U. S. Coast Guard now fall to the State due to a reduction in funding at the federal level for such activities. The waterway management fund will be derived from specified boating registration fees. In addition, this legislation also increases the current service charge that private licensing agents may charge to process boat registrations and boat ramp certificates, with such service charges being retained by the licensing agents to offset the costs of processing boat registrations and boat ramp certificates.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 23 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Waterway Management
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-30 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 35 YES 2 NO 2 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-15 | House | Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES) in House with 3 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits |
2016-06-10 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 1 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES & ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Assigned to Natural Resources & Environmental Control Committee in Senate |