DE SB216 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on August 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on August 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill reflects current practice within Family Court as to how and when one files for Extended Jurisdiction. This bill provides for a petition for extended jurisdiction to be filed by the youth who will be or was in foster care at age 18 or by the youth’s representative, requesting that Family Court be authorized to hold proceedings past the youth’s eighteenth birthday for the purpose of reviewing the youth’s independent living services. The current statute calls for a motion to be filed in the dependency, abuse, and neglect proceeding. By requiring a new petition to be filed at the youth’s request, this new procedure recognizes the young adult in their status as an independent adult and emphasizes the requirement that the jurisdiction be extended with the youth’s consent. As with the current statute, DSCYF is not required to provide any services for which funds have not been appropriated or exhausted.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 10 Of The Delaware Code Pertaining To Extended Jurisdiction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-07-01 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-05-18 | House | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 8 On Its Merits |
2016-04-28 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |