DE SB154 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act repeals the sunset of the Focus on Alternative Skills Training Program, which provides tuition for an eligible individual to attend an approved nondegree credit certificate program that provides industry-accepted skill training and certification.
Title
An Act To Amend Chapter 211, Volume 83 Of The Laws Of Delaware Relating To The Focus On Alternative Skills Training Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2023-06-21 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2023-06-20 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 2 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |
2023-06-16 | Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House | |
2023-06-15 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2023-06-15 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 154 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2023-06-14 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 154 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2023-06-14 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2023-06-14 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |
2023-06-14 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business, Insurance & Technology) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2023-06-01 | Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business, Insurance & Technology Committee in Senate |