DE SB128 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act is the result of the 2019 report of the Joint Legislative Oversight and Sunset Committee's (JLSOC) task force under Senate Resolution No. 9 of the 150th General Assembly, which recommended amending the Delaware Health Information Network's ("DHIN") chapter to conform existing law with the standards of the Delaware Legislative Drafting Manual. This Act makes technical corrections to the DHIN chapter, including the following:
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Delaware Health Information Network Chapter.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-10 | Signed by Governor | |
2021-06-23 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2021-06-18 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2021-06-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2021-05-27 | Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House | |
2021-05-20 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2021-05-19 | Reported Out of Committee (Legislative Oversight & Sunset) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2021-05-10 | Introduced and Assigned to Legislative Oversight & Sunset Committee in Senate |