DE SB1 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
In every December in the years 2010 through 2015, the Code Revisors provided the General Assembly with a list of potential technical corrections they identified as they revised the Delaware Code to reflect legislation enacted that year. While technical in nature, these changes are beyond the authority of the Code Revisors to make and can only be done by the General Assembly through legislation. After reviewing the 148 items provided for the years 2010 through 2015, the following changes included in this Act are identified as technical in nature and in need of correction. Of the other 99 items, many had already been corrected, some statutes no longer existed or were subsequently amended so that the correction is no longer necessary, and some would be substantive changes.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 4, Title 7, Title 10, Title 11, Title 14, Title 16, Title 18, Title 19, Title 21, Title 24, Title 25, Title 28, Title 29, Title 30, And Title 31 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Technical Corrections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-17 | Signed by Governor | |
2017-05-16 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2017-05-10 | Reported Out of Committee (House Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2017-05-03 | Assigned to House Administration Committee in House | |
2017-05-02 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2017-03-29 | Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2017-03-16 | Introduced and Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate |