DE HB79 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on August 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on August 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill provides that a striped bass must be tagged by a commercial fisherman before it is landed or put on shore.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Striped Bass.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2015-06-23 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Lifted From Table in Senate |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Laid On Table in Senate |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES & ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits |
2015-06-12 | Senate | Assigned to Natural Resources & Environmental Control Committee in Senate |
2015-06-11 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-03 | House | Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES) in House with 7 On Its Merits |
2015-04-02 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House |