DE HB404 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
In 2011, the State adopted concussion protections for youth involved in sports and athletic activities regulated by the Delaware Interscholastic Athletic Association (DIAA) codified at Title 14 Del. C. 303(d). However, the DIAA’s jurisdiction only applies to member schools and excludes youth athletic events sponsored by leagues, clubs, and other organizations. This bill is intended to fill this gap by establishing similar concussion protection standards for youth involved in non-DIAA regulated athletic activities.
Title
An Act To Amend Titles 16 And 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Concussion Protection In Youth Athletic Activities.
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Heffernan [D] | Rep. Stephanie Bolden [D] | Rep. Ruth Briggs King [R] | Rep. Ruth Briggs King [R] |
Rep. Helene Keeley [D] | Sen. Bethany Hall-Long [D] | Sen. Colin Bonini [R] | Sen. Ernesto Lopez [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-06 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-30 | House | Necessary rules are suspended in |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-29 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 33 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 8 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-29 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2016-06-29 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2016-06-29 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2016-06-14 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2016-06-08 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 2 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits |
2016-06-07 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |