DE HB393 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-20 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act is the result of recommendations made by the Joint Sunset Committee, and makes several changes to the State Use Law: Updates the law to use People First Language, including changing the name of the Commission for the Purchase of Products and Services of the Blind and Other Severely Handicapped Individuals to the Commission for Statewide Contracts to Support Employment for Individuals with Disabilities. Updates the names and descriptions of the organizations involved in state use contracts to reflect modern day realities. Based on the input from the Commission and the public, changes the make-up of Commission membership, to create a Commission that better serves the purposes of Chapter 96. Requires the Commission to promote an expanded and constant market for products and services under this chapter, rather than require the Commission to provide such a market. Removes the Delaware Association of Rehabilitation Facilities and adds the Ability Network Delaware or Commission representative of a community rehabilitation program to the list of entities who may propose to the Commission set-aside contracts with Agencies of this State. Provides that a Commission subcommittee shall review proposed revisions to set-aside prices, prior to the Commission voting whether to approve the price revision. Shifts all Commission subcommittees from advising outside entities to advising the Committee. Requires the Commission to promulgate regulations and sets the minimum subject areas that must be addressed by regulation. Governs the relationship between the Commission and Government Support Services, including the requirement that Government Support Services publish a list of products and services provided by community rehabilitation programs or central nonprofit agencies. This Act also makes technical corrections to conform existing law to the guidelines of the Delaware Legislative Drafting Manual.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The State Use Law And The Commission For The Purchase Of Products And Services Of The Blind And Other Severely Handicapped Individuals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-20 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate |
2016-06-22 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-08 | House | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET COMMITTEE (POLICY ANALYSIS & GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY)) in House with 3 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits |
2016-06-02 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House |