DE HB39 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to decriminalize the possession or private use of a personal use quantity of marijuana. More specifically, persons who possess one ounce or less of marijuana shall be assessed a civil penalty that will not become part of a criminal record and must forfeit the marijuana. Likewise, the private use or consumption of less than an ounce of marijuana shall be punishable by a civil penalty. Persons charged with one of these civil violations are not subject to incarceration. Furthermore, under Section 2 of this bill the public use or consumption of an ounce or less of marijuana will be an unclassified misdemeanor punishable by a fine of not more than $200 or imprisonment for not more than 5 days. This penalty is in line with the penalty for possession or consumption of an open container of alcohol in most municipalities in the state. This bill does not in any manner modify Title 21 driving offenses nor does it prohibit municipal regulation of marijuana use, consumption, or possession. A person charged or assessed a civil violation in connection with a personal use quantity of marijuana cannot also be charged with possession of drug paraphernalia. A person who is not charged with personal use quantity of marijuana possession can still be charged or assessed a civil violation of possession of drug paraphernalia. This bill does not repeal or modify existing laws relating to medical marijuana or penalties for the operation of motor vehicles under the influence.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Marijuana.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 12 YES 9 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |
2015-06-02 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 24 YES 14 NO 2 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-02 | House | Amendment HA 3 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2015-06-02 | House | Amendment HA 3 - Introduced in House |
2015-06-02 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Stricken |
2015-06-02 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Stricken |
2015-06-02 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2015-05-06 | House | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 3 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable |
2015-03-12 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |