DC PR24-1004 | 2021-2022 | 24th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-08 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-08 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Commission on Re-Entry and Returning Citizen Affairs John Matthews Confirmation Resolution of 2022
Title
Commission on Re-Entry and Returning Citizen Affairs John Matthews Confirmation Resolution of 2022
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-08 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2022-11-18 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-15 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-04 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR24-1004 Published in the DC Register |
2022-11-01 | Council | Referred to Committee on Government Operations and Facilities |
2022-10-24 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/PR24-1004 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/51504/Introduction/PR24-1004-Introduction.pdf |