DC B23-0708 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-14 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-14 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-708 provides a charitable rebate of The DC Central Kitchen, Inc.'s responsible portion of real property taxes owed for real property it leases from a for-profit owner, beginning with tax year 2021.
Title
The D.C. Central Kitchen, Inc. Tax Rebate Act of 2020
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-14 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-11-27 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-11-20 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-03-20 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0708 Published in the DC Register |
2020-03-17 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2020-03-09 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0708 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/44429/Introduction/B23-0708-Introduction.pdf |