CT SJ00158 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - File Number 473
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - File Number 473
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Decision Of The Claims Commissioner To Deny Certain Claims Against The State Pursuant To Chapter 53 Of The General Statutes.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Decision Of The Claims Commissioner To Deny Certain Claims Against The State Pursuant To Chapter 53 Of The General Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-01 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | File Number 473 |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 289 |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/24 12:00 PM |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |