CT SJ00075 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Convening The General Assembly In Special Session.
Title
Resolution Convening The General Assembly In Special Session.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 414 EMERGENCY CERTIFICATION (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 477 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 477 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | House | In Concurrence |
2021-06-16 | House | Adopted, House |
2021-06-15 | House | Immediate Transmittal to the House |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Emergency Certification |