CT SJ00026 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-09 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-09 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Vincent Mauro, Jr. Of New Haven To Be A Member Of The Board Of Directors Of The Connecticut Airport Authority.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Vincent Mauro, Jr. Of New Haven To Be A Member Of The Board Of Directors Of The Connecticut Airport Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 22 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-09 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2023-02-09 | House | Adopted, House |
2023-02-09 | House | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 28 |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/02 |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Nomination Referred to Committee on Executive and Legislative Nominations |