CT SB01212 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-18 - File Number 647
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-18 - File Number 647
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require a study of the criminal procedure laws of this state.
Title
An Act Concerning A Study Of The Criminal Procedure Laws Of This State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-31 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-18 | Senate | File Number 647 |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 374 |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/22 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |