CT SB01108 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To require businesses to disclose the proposed use of any personal information and to give consumers the right to discover what personal information the business possesses and to opt out of the sale of such information and to create a cause of action and penalties for violations of such requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Establishing A Task Force Concerning Consumer Privacy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 374 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 82 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-27SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-27SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-24SenateSpecial Act 19-24
2019-06-05SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-05SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-06-05SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-06-05SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-04-29SenateHouse Calendar Number 520
2019-04-29SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-25SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-04-25SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2019-04-25SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7538
2019-04-17SenateFile Number 745
2019-04-17SenateSenate Calendar Number 345
2019-04-17SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-17SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-11SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-02SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-01SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2019-03-21SenatePublic Hearing 03/25
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback