CT SB01107 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-15 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Labor and Public Employees
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-15 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Labor and Public Employees
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To ensure that homemaker-companion agencies that operate as registries or provide referral services classify persons providing home health care services properly and pay unemployment taxes accordingly.
Title
An Act Concerning Misclassification In The Homemaker-companion Agency Industry.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-15 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Labor and Public Employees | |
2011-03-14 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees | |
2011-03-11 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office LAB | |
2011-03-10 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-10 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Labor and Public Employees | |
2011-03-03 | Public Hearing 03/08 | |
2011-03-02 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |