CT SB01098 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To provide for the designation of certain synthetic cannabinoids and the herb salvia divinorum, and its active constituent salvinorum A, as controlled substances.
Title
An Act Regulating The Sale And Possession Of Synthetic Marijuana And Salvia Divinorum.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 404 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-08 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-24 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-17 | Public Act 11-73 | |
2011-06-07 | In Concurrence | |
2011-06-07 | On Consent Calendar | |
2011-06-07 | House Passed | |
2011-06-06 | House Calendar Number 632 | |
2011-06-06 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-06-06 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | |
2011-06-06 | Senate Passed | |
2011-05-19 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-05-19 | No New File by Committee on General Law | |
2011-05-18 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-18 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-18 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-05-11 | Referred by Senate to Committee on General Law | |
2011-04-27 | File Number 642 | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Calendar Number 401 | |
2011-04-27 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-27 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-20 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-04-15 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-04-15 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-10 | Public Hearing 03/14 | |
2011-03-01 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |