CT SB01062 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To reduce the sixty-day waiting period under the vessel lien process to thirty days.
Title
An Act Reducing The Waiting Period Under The Vessel Lien Process.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-12 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 178 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-30 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-22 | Public Act 11-118 | |
2011-06-08 | In Concurrence | |
2011-06-08 | On Consent Calendar | |
2011-06-08 | House Passed | |
2011-05-13 | House Calendar Number 517 | |
2011-05-13 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-05-12 | On Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-12 | Senate Passed | |
2011-04-27 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-27 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-04-27 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-27 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-26 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-04-21 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-04-05 | File Number 371 | |
2011-04-05 | Senate Calendar Number 238 | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-05 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-29 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-03-21 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-18 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-02-24 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |
2011-02-23 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |