CT SB01024 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-15 - File Number 80
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-15 - File Number 80
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish within the Department of Aging and Disability Services a dementia services coordinator.
Title
An Act Concerning A Dementia Services Coordinator.
Sponsors
House Aging Committee | Sen. Tony Hwang [R] | Rep. Dorinda Keenan Borer [D] | Sen. Jan Hochadel [D] |
Rep. Jane Garibay [D] | Rep. Anne Hughes [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-28 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-15 | Senate | File Number 80 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 76 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/14/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/23 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |