CT SB01020 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To ensure that persons and entities subject to the enforcement of a foreign defamation judgment are afforded the same or greater protections for freedom of speech and freedom of the press as such persons or entities would receive in this state.
Title
An Act Concerning The Enforcement Of A Defamation Judgment Entered By A Court Outside Of The United States.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 358 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 155 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 155 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Public Act 17-88 |
2017-06-06 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2017-06-06 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2017-06-06 | Senate | House Passed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | House Calendar Number 548 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-05-17 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2017-04-18 | Senate | File Number 651 |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 340 |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/17 10:00 AM |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/27 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |