CT SB01017 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-12 - File Number 570
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-12 - File Number 570
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Department of Education to study issues relating to elementary and secondary education in the state.
Title
An Act Concerning Unsubstantiated Allegations Of Abuse And Neglect By School Employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-24 - Joint - ED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-12 | Senate | File Number 570 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 304 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/20 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |