CT SB01013 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-14 - Motion Failed MF
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-14 - Motion Failed MF
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a special police force for Manchester Community College.
Title
An Act Concerning Campus Safety And Security At Manchester Community College.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | Senate | Motion Failed MF |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |
2015-03-31 | Senate | File Number 343 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 243 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/17 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |
Connecticut State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp |
Text | http://www.cga.ct.gov/2015/TOB/S/2015SB-01013-R00-SB.htm |
Text | http://www.cga.ct.gov/2015/TOB/S/2015SB-01013-R01-SB.htm |