CT SB01006 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To require a state agency to, upon request, notify an individual or business of the statute, regulation, permit or order by which it has acted in regard to such individual or business.
Title
An Act Requiring State Agencies To Cite Specific Statutory And Regulatory Authority For Their Actions.
Sponsors
House Commerce Committee | Rep. Vincent Candelora [R] | Rep. Elaine O'Brien [D] | Rep. Michael Molgano [R] |
Sen. Anthony Musto [D] | Rep. Lawrence Cafero [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 424 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 135 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 135 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Public Act 13-279 |
2013-06-05 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2013-06-05 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2013-06-05 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2013-06-05 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2013-04-19 | Senate | House Calendar Number 388 |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-04-18 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5799 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | File Number 157 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 157 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |