CT SB00989 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To remedy administrative inconsistencies in the application of eligibility provisions related to the Municipal Employees' Retirement Fund.
Title
An Act Concerning Reemployment And The Municipal Employees' Retirement System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 341 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 300 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 300 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-02 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Public Act 15-188 |
2015-06-02 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2015-06-02 | Senate | House Passed |
2015-05-29 | Senate | House Calendar Number 654 |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-05-27 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-15 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development |
2015-03-30 | Senate | File Number 301 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 230 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 10:00 AM |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |