CT SB00986 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-7)
Status: Passed on June 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-7)
Status: Passed on June 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Protecting Maternal Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 320 AS AMENDED (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 313 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 45 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 313 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 45 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Public Act 23-147 |
2023-06-06 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2023-06-06 | House | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2023-06-06 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2023-06-02 | House | House Calendar Number 622 |
2023-06-02 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-06-01 | House | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8974 |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-05-02 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-04-04 | Senate | File Number 425 |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 238 |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |