CT SB00980 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To eliminate the age restriction for placement with special study foster parents.
Title
An Act Concerning Placement Of Children With Special Study Foster Parents.
Sponsors
Sen. Mae Flexer [D] | Rep. Lile Gibbons [R] | Sen. Edwin Gomes [D] | Sen. Tony Hwang [R] |
House Select Committee on Children | Sen. Donald Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-13 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 70 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 83 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 83 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-30 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-28 | Public Act 11-166 | |
2011-06-08 | In Concurrence | |
2011-06-08 | On Consent Calendar | |
2011-06-08 | House Passed | |
2011-04-15 | House Calendar Number 331 | |
2011-04-15 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-04-13 | On Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-13 | Senate Passed | |
2011-03-31 | File Number 307 | |
2011-03-31 | Senate Calendar Number 204 | |
2011-03-31 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-03-31 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-25 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-03-18 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-17 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-03-09 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services | |
2011-03-09 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Human Services | |
2011-03-08 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-04 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-03 | Joint Favorable HS | |
2011-02-18 | Public Hearing 02/22 | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |