CT SB00930 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-05 - House Calendar Number 481
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-05 - House Calendar Number 481
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require nursing home facilities to notify the State Ombudsman of a proposed transfer or discharge of a resident.
Title
An Act Requiring Notice Of A Proposed Involuntary Transfer Or Discharge Of A Nursing Facility Resident To The State Ombudsman.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 116 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | House Calendar Number 481 |
2023-05-05 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-05-03 | House | On Consent Calendar |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6617 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | File Number 99 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 89 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/16 |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |