CT SB00905 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - Senate Recommitted to Veterans' Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - Senate Recommitted to Veterans' Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the Departments of Public Health and Veterans' Affairs to study and report on the implementation of a treatment program for traumatic brain injuries and post-traumatic stress disorder.
Title
An Act Requiring The Department Of Public Health To Study The Implementation Of A Program For The Treatment Of Veterans With Traumatic Brain Injuries And Post-traumatic Stress Disorder.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Senate | Senate Recommitted to Veterans' Affairs |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-30 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Public Health |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Health |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6063 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | File Number 69 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 106 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/11/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/17 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |