CT SB00896 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To allow for quicker provision of protective services for suspected elderly abuse victims.
Title
An Act Concerning Protective Services For Suspected Elderly Abuse Victims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 325 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 250 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 250 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-02 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Public Act 15-233 |
2015-06-02 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2015-06-02 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-06-02 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-22 | Senate | House Calendar Number 615 |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-05-20 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7823 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-06 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Aging |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Aging |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-22 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-30 | Senate | File Number 294 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 223 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/15 10:00 AM |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/19 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |