CT SB00895 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To clarify the definition of carbonated beverage, enable the sale of certain labeled beverage containers after January 1, 2024, and authorize temporary reserves in deposit initiator accounts for future increased refund values.
Title
An Act Concerning The Labeling Of Certain Beverage Containers, The Review Of Municipal Programs Funded By Nip Payments And The Return Of Beverage Containers For The Redemption Value.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 262 AS AMENDED (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 212 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 212 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Public Act 23-76 |
2023-06-02 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2023-06-02 | House | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2023-06-02 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-19 | House | House Calendar Number 567 |
2023-05-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7602 |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-05-03 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2023-03-07 | Senate | File Number 33 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 50 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/06/23 5:00 PM |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Public Hearing 01/30 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |