CT SB00878 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To make clarifying changes to the higher education statutes in accordance with the higher education reorganization.
Title
An Act Making Clarifying Changes To The Higher Education Statutes In Accordance With The Reorganization Of The Higher Education System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 424 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 217 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 217 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-02 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Public Act 13-240 |
2013-06-05 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2013-06-05 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2013-06-05 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2013-06-05 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-09 | Senate | House Calendar Number 552 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-05-08 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6084 |
2013-04-15 | Senate | File Number 481 |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 376 |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/13 10:00 AM |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/14 |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |