CT SB00857 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To establish an expedited review of affirmative action plans submitted by contractors to the Commission on Human Rights and Opportunities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Expedited Approval Of Affirmative Action Plans Submitted By Contractors To The Commission On Human Rights And Opportunities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 374 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 57 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2019-06-24SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2019-06-19SenatePublic Act 19-94
2019-06-05SenateIn Concurrence
2019-06-05SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-06-05SenateHouse Passed
2019-04-18SenateHouse Calendar Number 467
2019-04-18SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2019-04-17SenateOn Consent Calendar
2019-04-17SenateSenate Passed
2019-04-08SenateFile Number 522
2019-04-08SenateSenate Calendar Number 240
2019-04-08SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-08SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-01SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-21SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-03-20SenateJoint Favorable
2019-02-22SenatePublic Hearing 02/27
2019-02-14SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback