CT SB00764 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To authorize the city of Middletown to join the Mattabassett District and to give it voting rights on the board of directors, and to make changes to certain provisions of number 134 of the special acts of 1963 concerning the issuance of bonds by the Mattabassett District.
Title
An Act Concerning The Mattabassett District.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 333 AS AMENDED (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 350 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 350 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-06-30 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-06-28 | Special Act 11-15 | |
2011-06-08 | In Concurrence | |
2011-06-08 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-08 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-03 | House Calendar Number 590 | |
2011-06-03 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-06-02 | On Consent Calendar | |
2011-06-02 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-06-02 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8129 | |
2011-05-11 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-05-11 | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2011-05-10 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-10 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-10 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-05-05 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2011-04-27 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-27 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |
2011-04-27 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-27 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-27 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-04-21 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |
2011-04-13 | File Number 503 | |
2011-04-13 | Senate Calendar Number 303 | |
2011-04-13 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-13 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-07 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-03-28 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-25 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-03-23 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development | |
2011-03-22 | Drafted by Committee | |
2011-03-07 | Vote to Draft | |
2011-02-25 | Public Hearing 03/02 | |
2011-01-31 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing | |
2011-01-25 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |