CT SB00478 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - File Number 364
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - File Number 364
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To make changes to the duties of the Health Reinsurance Association and requirements of the Connecticut Small Employer Reinsurance Pool, to update the preexisting conditions statute, and to require approval of small employer premium rates by the Insurance Department.
Title
An Act Concerning The Duties Of The Health Reinsurance Association And Requirements Of The Connecticut Small Employer Reinsurance Pool, Updating The Preexisting Conditions Statute, And Concerning Certain Group Health Insurance Policies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | Senate | File Number 364 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 269 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 10:00 AM |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |