CT SB00442 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - File Number 618
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - File Number 618
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To increase the amount of the health insurance subsidy paid by the teachers' retirement system to three hundred fifty dollars per month.
Title
An Act Increasing The Amount Of The Teachers' Retirement System Health Insurance Subsidy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | File Number 618 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 446 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/25/22 12:00 PM |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/21 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |