CT SB00419 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-06 - File Number 517
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-06 - File Number 517
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To exempt from property taxes specified real property used for permanent housing owned by, or held in trust for, federally tax-exempt organizations organized exclusively for charitable purposes.
Title
An Act Concerning Property Taxes For Nonprofit Group Homes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | Senate | File Number 517 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 337 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |