CT SB00395 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit the reporting of medical debt to credit rating agencies and impose penalties via reduction or withdrawal of Medicaid funds to the extent permissible under federal law.
Title
An Act Concerning The Reporting Of Medical Debt.
Sponsors
House Human Services Committee | Sen. Martin Looney [D] | Sen. Saud Anwar [D] | Sen. Matthew Lesser [D] |
Rep. Juan Candelaria [D] | Rep. Hubert Delany [D] | Sen. Kevin Kelly [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 124 SENATE AMD A (Y: 92 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 125 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 52 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 126 AS AMENDED (Y: 106 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 102 (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 125 HOUSE AMD A (Y: 52 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 126 AS AMENDED (Y: 106 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 102 (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Public Act 24-6 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2024-05-02 | House | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2024-05-02 | House | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 5288 |
2024-05-02 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2024-04-19 | House | House Calendar Number 406 |
2024-04-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3882 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | File Number 264 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 190 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/14 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |